DIRECTOR :
CHANDER PARKASH GAUBA
As On :
Saturday, 21 September 2024
Total Page Views : 3 Name | CHANDER PARKASH GAUBA |
Total Companies | 13 |
First Appointment Date | Friday, 16 February 1990 |
Last Resigned Date | |
Social Links | |
CHANDER PARKASH GAUBA was appointed on Friday, 16 February 1990 with V AND S INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 34 Year(s), 7 month(s), 5 day(s), and also appointed on Friday, 14 August 1992 with V AND S INTERNATIONAL PVT LTD - DELHI - Total Tenure of 32 Year(s), 1 month(s), 7 day(s), and also appointed on Wednesday, 07 January 1998 with V AND S PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 26 Year(s), 8 month(s), 14 day(s), and also appointed on Wednesday, 07 January 1998 with J G ELECTROS PRIVATE LIMITED - CHANDIGARH - Total Tenure of 26 Year(s), 8 month(s), 14 day(s), and also appointed on Monday, 05 June 2000 with V AND S TEXNITS PRIVATE LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 24 Year(s), 3 month(s), 16 day(s), and also appointed on Monday, 21 March 2005 with MANU CREATIONS PPRIVATE LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 19 Year(s), 6 month(s), 0 day(s), and also appointed on Friday, 29 December 2006 with GAUBA SONS HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 17 Year(s), 8 month(s), 23 day(s), and also appointed on Tuesday, 23 January 2007 with MEHTA WHEELS PRIVATE LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 17 Year(s), 7 month(s), 29 day(s), and also appointed on Friday, 15 June 2012 with V & S DWELLERS PRIVATE LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 12 Year(s), 3 month(s), 6 day(s), and also appointed on Friday, 28 March 2014 with BULL AND BEAR SHARES PRIVATE LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 10 Year(s), 5 month(s), 24 day(s), and also appointed on Monday, 26 October 2015 with DESTINI INDIA LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 8 Year(s), 10 month(s), 26 day(s), and also appointed on Monday, 02 August 2021 with V & S INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED - DELHI - Total Tenure of 3 Year(s), 1 month(s), 19 day(s), and also appointed on Tuesday, 05 September 2023 with SALVEEN AMOUR LLP - DELHI - Total Tenure of 1 Year(s), 0 month(s), 16 day(s)
Rank | Logo | CIN | Company Name | City | Appointed Date | Resign Date | Date of Incorporation | Status |
115240 | | U74899DL1990PTC039251 | V AND S INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED | DELHI | Friday, 16 February 1990 | | Friday, 16 February 1990 | |
11205 | | U74899DL1992PTC049964 | V AND S INTERNATIONAL PVT LTD | DELHI | Friday, 14 August 1992 | | Friday, 14 August 1992 | |
143219 | | U70109DL1996PTC079487 | V AND S PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED | DELHI | Wednesday, 07 January 1998 | | Thursday, 06 June 1996 | |
1010638 | | U29308CH1995PTC016920 | J G ELECTROS PRIVATE LIMITED | CHANDIGARH | Wednesday, 07 January 1998 | | Monday, 21 August 1995 | |
1197084 | | U18101DL2000PTC106099 | V AND S TEXNITS PRIVATE LIMITED | DELHI | Monday, 05 June 2000 | | Monday, 05 June 2000 | |
1246474 | | U18101DL2001PTC112671 | MANU CREATIONS PPRIVATE LIMITED | DELHI | Monday, 21 March 2005 | | Thursday, 04 October 2001 | |
1237235 | | U74992HR2006PTC036513 | GAUBA SONS HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED | DELHI | Friday, 29 December 2006 | | Friday, 29 December 2006 | |
1232350 | | U50101HR2006PTC049596 | MEHTA WHEELS PRIVATE LIMITED | DELHI | Tuesday, 23 January 2007 | | Thursday, 09 November 2006 | |
1995828 | | U45200HR2012PTC046237 | V & S DWELLERS PRIVATE LIMITED | DELHI | Friday, 15 June 2012 | | Friday, 15 June 2012 | |
69526 | | U74899DL1994PTC059236 | BULL AND BEAR SHARES PRIVATE LIMITED | DELHI | Friday, 28 March 2014 | | Thursday, 26 May 1994 | |
61530 | | U17110DL1998PLC096947 | DESTINI INDIA LIMITED | DELHI | Monday, 26 October 2015 | | Thursday, 05 November 1998 | |
98423 | | U55101DL1999PTC098356 | V & S INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | DELHI | Monday, 02 August 2021 | | Thursday, 11 February 1999 | |
3404651 | | ACC-8611 | SALVEEN AMOUR LLP | DELHI | Tuesday, 05 September 2023 | | Tuesday, 05 September 2023 | |
Suit Filed accounts of Rs. 25 Lacs and above Total Suit Filed : 0
# | Category | Bank / FI | Branch | Outstanding Amount In Lacs | Asset Classification | Date Of Classification | Suit |
Report Director Information Discrepancy
The information shown on this page was last updated onSaturday, 21 September 2024
Due to frequent changes in Director Information, it is possible that some details you see may be out-of-date. If you feel the information is not up-to-date, you may request to get this page auto-updated now.
Request For Update If you still notice any discrepancy, please help by reporting it to us.
We appreciate your help!
Report Discrepancy